DC PR22-1100 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Resolution R22-0635 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Resolution R22-0635 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board Of Trustees Of The University Of The District Of Columbia Ken Grossinger Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Title
Board Of Trustees Of The University Of The District Of Columbia Ken Grossinger Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-13 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Council | Resolution R22-0635 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13166 |
2018-11-20 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-1100 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0635 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-13 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-11-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-1100 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |