DC PR22-1054 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Resolution R22-0653 Effective from November 30, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Resolution R22-0653 Effective from November 30, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2020 Budget Submission Requirements Resolution Of 2018
Title
Fiscal Year 2020 Budget Submission Requirements Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-13 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Council | Resolution R22-0653 Effective from November 30, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13168 |
2018-11-30 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0653 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-10-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-1054 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-16 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-10-16 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |