DC PR22-1024 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-23 - Resolution R22-0639 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12981
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-23 - Resolution R22-0639 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12981
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
American College Of Cardiology Foundation Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution Of 2018
Title
American College Of Cardiology Foundation Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-13 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-23 | Council | Resolution R22-0639 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12981 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0639 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-1024 |
2018-10-10 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-1024 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-09-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |