DC PR22-1004 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-26 - Resolution R22-0631 Effective from October 16, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11879
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-26 - Resolution R22-0631 Effective from October 16, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11879
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Precision Truck Repair, Inc.
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Cw25390 With Precision Truck Repair, Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-26 | Council | Resolution R22-0631 Effective from October 16, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11879 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0631 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-10-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |