DC PR22-0902 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Resolution R22-0532 Effective from June 26, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7728
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Resolution R22-0532 Effective from June 26, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7728
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Adrian L. Merton, Inc.
Title
Modification Nos. 9 Through 11 To Contract No. Dcam-16-nc-0034a Approval And Payment Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | Council | Resolution R22-0532 Effective from June 26, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7728 |
2018-06-26 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0532 |
2018-06-26 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-26 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-06-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |