DC PR22-0784 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Resolution R22-0449 Effective from March 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Resolution R22-0449 Effective from March 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Keystone Plus Construction Corporation
Title
Contract No. Dcam-17-cs-0025d Modification Nos. 01 And 02 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Council | Resolution R22-0449 Effective from March 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2673 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0449 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-03-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-02-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |