DC PR22-0694 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Resolution R22-0464 Effective from April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4295
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Resolution R22-0464 Effective from April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4295
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revised Abra Civil Penalty Schedule Resolution Of 2017
Title
Revised Abra Civil Penalty Schedule Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | Council | Resolution R22-0464 Effective from April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4295 |
2018-04-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0464 |
2018-04-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-04-04 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-27 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0694 |
2018-02-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-01-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2017-12-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0694 Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |