DC PR22-0671 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Resolution R22-0384 Effective from January 9, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 598
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Resolution R22-0384 Effective from January 9, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 598
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To approve CA 22-346
Title
Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2016-lrsp-05a Approval Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Council | Resolution R22-0384 Effective from January 9, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 598 |
2018-01-09 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0384 |
2018-01-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-12-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-12-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0671 Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |