DC PR22-0159 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Resolution R22-0047 Effective from March 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3307
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Resolution R22-0047 Effective from March 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3307
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Business License Technology Fee Reauthorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Title
Business License Technology Fee Reauthorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | Council | Resolution R22-0047 Effective from March 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3307 |
2017-03-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0047 |
2017-03-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-03-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-03-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |