DC PR22-0126 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-24 - Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0126 Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-24 - Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0126 Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deemed disapproved 5/31/2017
Title
District Of Columbia Water And Sewer Authority Board Of Directors Maria Powell Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0126 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-02-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0126 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37451/PR22-0126-Introduction.pdf |