DC PR22-0103 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extreme Weather Protection For Animals Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Title
Extreme Weather Protection For Animals Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-02-17 | Council | Resolution R22-0027 Effective from February 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 1705 |
2017-02-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0027 |
2017-02-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-02-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |