DC PR22-0080 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Resolution R22-0022 Effective from February 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 1697
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Resolution R22-0022 Effective from February 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 1697
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With PSI Family Services, Inc.
Title
Modifications To Human Care Agreement No. Dcrl-2013-h-0039c With Psi Family Services, Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Council | Resolution R22-0022 Effective from February 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 1697 |
2017-02-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0022 |
2017-02-07 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-02-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-01-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |