DC PR20-1118 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-12 - Resolution R20-0709 Effective from Dec 2, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12587
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-12 - Resolution R20-0709 Effective from Dec 2, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12587
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense Of The Council Encouraging The District Prudent Investment With Regard To Fossil Fuels Resolution Of 2014
Title
Sense Of The Council Encouraging The District Prudent Investment With Regard To Fossil Fuels Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-12 | Council | Resolution R20-0709 Effective from Dec 2, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12587 |
2014-12-02 | Council | First Reading |
2014-10-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-1118 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-10-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-10-27 | Council | PR20-1118 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |