DC PR20-1076 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - Resolution R20-0665 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11984
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - Resolution R20-0665 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11984
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Convention And Sports Authority Board Of Directors Linda Greenan Confirmation Resolution Of 2014
Title
Washington Convention And Sports Authority Board Of Directors Linda Greenan Confirmation Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Council | Resolution R20-0665 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11984 |
2014-10-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2014-10-22 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-10-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR20-1076 |
2014-10-16 | Council | Roundtable Hearing on PR20-1076 |
2014-10-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-1076 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-10-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2014-10-03 | Council | PR20-1076 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |