DC PR20-1052 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - Resolution R20-0678 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11998
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - Resolution R20-0678 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11998
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Inspector General Qualifications Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Title
Inspector General Qualifications Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Council | Resolution R20-0678 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11998 |
2014-10-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2014-10-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-09-25 | Council | PR20-1052 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |