DC PR20-0763 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Resolution R20-0544 Effective from Jul 14, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 7813
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Resolution R20-0544 Effective from Jul 14, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 7813
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Young School Surplus Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Title
Young School Surplus Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-14 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Council | Resolution R20-0544 Effective from Jul 14, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 7813 |
2014-07-14 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2014-06-18 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-06-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR20-0763 |
2014-06-05 | Council | Roundtable Hearing on PR20-0763 |
2014-05-30 | Council | Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-05-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0763 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-05-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2014-05-02 | Council | PR20-0763 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |