DC CER25-0152 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-05 - Resolution ACR25-0150, Effective from Dec 05, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-05 - Resolution ACR25-0150, Effective from Dec 05, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Maudine Cooper Memorial Recognition Resolution of 2023
Title
Maudine Cooper Memorial Recognition Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-05 | Council | Resolution ACR25-0150, Effective from Dec 05, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000015 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR25-0150 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-11-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |