DC CER24-0190 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Resolution ACR24-0186, Effective from Jun 07, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 007794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Resolution ACR24-0186, Effective from Jun 07, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 007794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Assistant Chief Chanel Dickerson Recognition Resolution of 2022
Title
Assistant Chief Chanel Dickerson Recognition Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0186, Effective from Jun 07, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 007794 |
2022-06-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0186 |
2022-06-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-06-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-05-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |