DC CER24-0177 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Resolution ACR24-0174, Effective from May 03, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 006321
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Resolution ACR24-0174, Effective from May 03, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 006321
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Garlinda Bryant-Rollins Retirement Recognition Resolution of 2022
Title
Garlinda Bryant-Rollins Retirement Recognition Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0174, Effective from May 03, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 006321 |
2022-05-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0174 |
2022-05-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-05-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-04-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |