DC CER24-0116 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-07 - Resolution ACR24-0113, Effective from Dec 07, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000032
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-07 - Resolution ACR24-0113, Effective from Dec 07, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000032
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Johnny L. Gant, Sr. Posthumous Recognition Ceremonial Resolution of 2021
Title
Johnny L. Gant, Sr. Posthumous Recognition Ceremonial Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-07 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0113, Effective from Dec 07, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000032 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0113 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-12-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-12-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |