DC CER24-0112 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on November 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-07 - Resolution ACR24-0109, Effective from Nov 16, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000025
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on November 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-07 - Resolution ACR24-0109, Effective from Nov 16, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000025
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Councilmember William Ridley Spaulding Memorial Recognition Resolution of 2021
Title
Councilmember William Ridley Spaulding Memorial Recognition Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-16 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-07 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0109, Effective from Nov 16, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000025 |
2021-11-16 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0109 |
2021-11-16 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-11-16 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-11-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |