DC CER24-0022 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Resolution ACR24-0022, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Resolution ACR24-0022, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Judge Emmet G. Sullivan Recognition Resolution of 2021
Title
Judge Emmet G. Sullivan Recognition Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0022, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005165 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0022 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-03-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-03-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |