DC CER23-0227 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Resolution ACR23-0227, Effective from Apr 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3977
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Resolution ACR23-0227, Effective from Apr 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3977
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Women's Democratic Club Recognition Resolution of 2020
Title
Metropolitan Women's Democratic Club Recognition Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0227, Effective from Apr 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3977 |
2020-04-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0227 |
2020-01-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-01-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-01-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |