DC CER23-0197 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Resolution ACR23-0197 Effective from March 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Kwame Onwuachi Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kwame Onwuachi Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20CouncilResolution ACR23-0197 Effective from March 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3125
2020-03-20CouncilApproved with Resolution Number ACR23-0197
2019-11-05CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-11-05CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-11-04CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback