DC CER23-0189 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Resolution ACR23-0189, Effective from Mar 13, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2748
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Resolution ACR23-0189, Effective from Mar 13, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2748
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Express Distributor and Journalist Appreciation Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
Express Distributor and Journalist Appreciation Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0189, Effective from Mar 13, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2748 |
2020-03-13 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0189 |
2019-11-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-11-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-11-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |