DC CER23-0111 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Resolution ACR23-0111, Effective from Nov 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14851
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Resolution ACR23-0111, Effective from Nov 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14851
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Kojo Nnamdi 20th Anniversary Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
Kojo Nnamdi 20th Anniversary Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0111, Effective from Nov 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14851 |
2019-11-08 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0111 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-06-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-06-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |