DC CER23-0095 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Resolution ACR23-0095, Effective from Oct 25, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13978
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Resolution ACR23-0095, Effective from Oct 25, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13978
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
40th Anniversary of the Marion Barry Youth Leadership Institute Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
40th Anniversary of the Marion Barry Youth Leadership Institute Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-25 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0095, Effective from Oct 25, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13978 |
2019-10-25 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0095 |
2019-05-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-05-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-05-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |