DC CER23-0022 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Resolution ACR23-0022, Effective from Mar 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3680
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Resolution ACR23-0022, Effective from Mar 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3680
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jackie Stanley Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
Jackie Stanley Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0022, Effective from Mar 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3680 |
2019-03-29 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0022 |
2019-03-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-02-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |