DC CER22-0204 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-03 - Resolution ACR22-0204 Effective from November 3, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 11467
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-03 - Resolution ACR22-0204 Effective from November 3, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 11467
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The American Foundation For Suicide Prevention 11th Annual Out Of The Darkness Walk Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Title
The American Foundation For Suicide Prevention 11th Annual Out Of The Darkness Walk Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-03 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0204 Effective from November 3, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 11467 |
2017-11-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0204 |
2017-10-03 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-10-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-10-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |