DC CER22-0010 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Resolution ACR22-0010 Effective from February 17, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 1709
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Resolution ACR22-0010 Effective from February 17, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 1709
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Gladys Whitworth Bray Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Title
Dr. Gladys Whitworth Bray Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0010 Effective from February 17, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 1709 |
2017-02-17 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0010 |
2017-02-07 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-02-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-01-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |