DC B25-0788 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2024 Revised Local Budget Temporary Act of 2024
Title
Fiscal Year 2024 Revised Local Budget Temporary Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-09 - Council - Amendment (R.White) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-09 - Council - Amendment (R.White) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-07-09 | Council | Amendment (R.White) |
2024-06-12 | Council | First Reading |
2024-06-12 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2024-06-12 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute |
2024-05-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-04-23 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-04-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |