DC B25-0732 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Act A25-0455 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004658
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Act A25-0455 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004658
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Technical Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Technical Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Council | Act A25-0455 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004658 |
2024-04-19 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jun 14, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-04-15 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0455 |
2024-04-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 22, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-03-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0732 Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-05 | Council | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |