DC B25-0640 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on December 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-640 would clarify the use of the Ballpark Revenue Fund and establish the Ballpark Maintenance Fund.
Title
Ballpark Budget and Maintenance Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-02-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-01-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0640 Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0640 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54517/Introduction/B25-0640-Introduction.pdf |