DC B25-0594 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Streatery Program Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Streatery Program Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Council - Postponed to Postponed Indefinitely (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Council | Postponed Indefinitely |
2024-02-06 | Council | Postponed to March 5, 2024 (McDuffie & Allen) |
2024-01-09 | Council | Postponed to 2/6/2024 |
2023-12-19 | Council | Postponed to January 9, 2024 |
2023-12-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0594 Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-05 | Council | First Reading |
2023-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-12-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |