DC B25-0590 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-12 - Act A25-0345 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000650, Expires on Apr 03, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-12 - Act A25-0345 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000650, Expires on Apr 03, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Housing Authority Stabilization and Reform Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Title
District of Columbia Housing Authority Stabilization and Reform Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-12 | Council | Act A25-0345 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000650, Expires on Apr 03, 2024 |
2024-01-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-01-04 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0345, Expires on Apr 03, 2024 |
2023-12-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 5, 2024 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-12-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |