DC B25-0176 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Law L25-0105, Effective from Jan 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001653
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Law L25-0105, Effective from Jan 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001653
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-176 would designate the 1400 Block of Morse Street, N.E., in Ward 5, as Edna Brown Coleman Way.
Title
Edna Brown Coleman Way Designation Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Council | Law L25-0105, Effective from Jan 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001653 |
2023-12-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-12-01 | Council | Act A25-0307 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015454 |
2023-11-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-11-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0307 |
2023-11-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2023 |
2023-11-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-10-10 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-10-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-10-03 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0176 |
2023-07-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0176 Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |