DC B25-0003 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-01-27 - Act A25-0001 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 001042, Expires on Apr 17, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-01-27 - Act A25-0001 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 001042, Expires on Apr 17, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Attorney General Civil Rights Enforcement Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Attorney General Civil Rights Enforcement Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | Council | Act A25-0001 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 001042, Expires on Apr 17, 2023 |
2023-01-18 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-01-17 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0001, Expires on Apr 17, 2023 |
2023-01-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-01-05 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 20, 2023 |
2023-01-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-01-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |