DC B25-0001 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-27 - Act A25-0002 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 001044, Expires on Apr 19, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-27 - Act A25-0002 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 001044, Expires on Apr 19, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law Enforcement Career Opportunities for District Residents Expansion Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Law Enforcement Career Opportunities for District Residents Expansion Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | Council | Act A25-0002 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 001044, Expires on Apr 19, 2023 |
2023-01-23 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-01-19 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0002, Expires on Apr 19, 2023 |
2023-01-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 23, 2023 |
2023-01-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-01-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |