DC B24-1047 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
River East at Grandview Condominiums Property Tax Exemption Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Title
River East at Grandview Condominiums Property Tax Exemption Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2022-12-02 | Council | Act A24-0665 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014760 |
2022-11-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-11-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0665 |
2022-11-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 29, 2022 |
2022-11-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-11-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-10-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-1047 Published in the DC Register |
2022-10-18 | Council | First Reading |
2022-10-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |