DC B24-0978 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 17 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0227, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000023, Expires on Aug 03, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 17 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0227, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000023, Expires on Aug 03, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of For Hire Vehicles Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Department of For Hire Vehicles Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-06 | Council | Law L24-0227, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000023, Expires on Aug 03, 2023 |
2022-11-11 | Council | Act A24-0616 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 013987 |
2022-11-07 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-11-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-11-01 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0616 |
2022-10-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2022 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-10-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading |
2022-09-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |