DC B24-0951 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-13 - Act A24-0706 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000198
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-13 - Act A24-0706 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000198
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see FIS for more information.
Title
Automatic Voter Registration Expansion Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-13 | Council | Act A24-0706 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000198 |
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2023-01-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-12-28 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0706 |
2022-12-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 4, 2023 |
2022-12-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-11-15 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-11-08 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-03 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0951 |
2022-11-02 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-09-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-08-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0951 Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |