DC B24-0929 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-29 - Act A24-0513 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009390, Expires on Oct 23, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-29 - Act A24-0513 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009390, Expires on Oct 23, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2022 and Fiscal Year 2023 District Government Employee Pay Schedules Emergency Act of 2022
Title
Fiscal Year 2022 and Fiscal Year 2023 District Government Employee Pay Schedules Emergency Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-12 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-29 | Council | Act A24-0513 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009390, Expires on Oct 23, 2022 |
2022-07-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0513, Expires on Oct 23, 2022 |
2022-07-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 4, 2022 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Amendment (Silverman) |
2022-07-12 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-07-12 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-07-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |