DC B24-0898 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Act A24-0516 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009783, Expires on Oct 25, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Act A24-0516 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009783, Expires on Oct 25, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Engineering Licensure Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Engineering Licensure Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-05 | Council | Act A24-0516 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009783, Expires on Oct 25, 2022 |
2022-07-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0516, Expires on Oct 25, 2022 |
2022-07-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 1, 2022 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-07-12 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-07-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |