DC B24-0604 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 24 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-11 - Act A24-0321 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001048, Expires on May 05, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 24 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-11 - Act A24-0321 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001048, Expires on May 05, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Office of Administrative Hearings Unemployment Appeals Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Office of Administrative Hearings Unemployment Appeals Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Council | Act A24-0321 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001048, Expires on May 05, 2022 |
2022-02-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-02-04 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0321, Expires on May 05, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 7, 2022 |
2022-01-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-01-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-01-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |