DC B24-0502 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Law L24-0147, Effective from Jul 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009778
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Law L24-0147, Effective from Jul 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009778
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-502 would amend various acts to correct technical errors, provide clarifications, and make conforming amendments.
Title
Technical Amendments Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-05 | Council | Law L24-0147, Effective from Jul 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009778 |
2022-04-15 | Council | Act A24-0371 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 003386 |
2022-04-14 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-04-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-04-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0371 |
2022-03-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 11, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-02-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-02-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-01-18 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0502 |
2021-11-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0502 Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-11-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |