DC B24-0443 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-443 would require sufficient funding for a school librarian at each District of Columbia Public School.
Title
Students’ Right to Read Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-10-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0443 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-10-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0443 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/48037/Introduction/B24-0443-Introduction.pdf |