DC B24-0391 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-05 - Act A24-0193 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 011599, Expires on Jan 30, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-05 - Act A24-0193 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 011599, Expires on Jan 30, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Office of Administrative Hearings Unemployment Appeals Extension Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Office of Administrative Hearings Unemployment Appeals Extension Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-05 | Council | Act A24-0193 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 011599, Expires on Jan 30, 2022 |
2021-11-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-11-01 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0193, Expires on Jan 30, 2022 |
2021-10-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 1, 2021 |
2021-10-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-10-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |