DC B24-0370 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-370 would create and enhanced wage that contractors must pay on certain underground electrical utility projects and a prevailing wage pay scale for a large category of workers. Among other things it establishes an Underground Utility Work (UUW) minimum wage at $20 per hour for all contracts over $250,000 awarded by the electric company and increases the minimum wage by $1 each year until it reaches $22 per hour.
Title
Electrical Utility Underground Work Wage Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-07-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-08-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0370 Published in the DC Register |
2021-08-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2021-07-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0370 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/47736/Introduction/B24-0370-Introduction.pdf |