DC B24-0345 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Act A24-0125 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007342, Expires on Oct 22, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Act A24-0125 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007342, Expires on Oct 22, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Emergency Extension and Eviction and Utility Moratorium Phasing Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Public Emergency Extension and Eviction and Utility Moratorium Phasing Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (E. Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (C. Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (K. McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (R. White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (E. Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (C. Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (K. McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Revised Amendment (R. White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (R. White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (E. Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (C. Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (K. McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (R. White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (E. Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (C. Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (K. McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Revised Amendment (R. White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Council - Amendment (R. White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Council | Act A24-0125 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007342, Expires on Oct 22, 2021 |
2021-07-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-07-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0125, Expires on Oct 22, 2021 |
2021-07-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 5, 2021 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-07-13 | Council | Amendment (E. Silverman) |
2021-07-13 | Council | Amendment (C. Allen) |
2021-07-13 | Council | Amendment (K. McDuffie) |
2021-07-13 | Council | Amendment (R. White) |
2021-07-13 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-07-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |