DC B24-0291 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Law L24-0096, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002366
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Law L24-0096, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002366
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-291 would remove from the plan for extension of a permanent system of highways a portion of 50th Street, NE., located within Lot 825 in Square 5194. It calls for the closing of 50th Street, N.E. and Nannie Helen Burroughs Avenue, N.E., adjacent to Square 5194 and accepts the dedication of Lots 828 and 830 in Square 5194 for public street purposes.
Title
Omnibus Progressive National Baptist Convention Redevelopment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Council | Law L24-0096, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002366 |
2022-01-31 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-01-28 | Council | Act A24-0297 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000610 |
2022-01-24 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-01-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0297 |
2022-01-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 24, 2022 |
2021-12-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-12-20 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-12-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2021-11-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0291 |
2021-10-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0291 Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-06-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |